MI SB0196 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-05 - Assigned Pa 0253'18 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-05 - Assigned Pa 0253'18 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Individual income tax; other; credit income tax checkoff contributions to the fostering futures scholarship trust fund; provide for. Amends sec. 9 of 2008 PA 525 (MCL 722.1029). TIE BAR WITH: SB 0197'17
Title
Individual income tax; other; credit income tax checkoff contributions to the fostering futures scholarship trust fund; provide for. Amends sec. 9 of 2008 PA 525 (MCL 722.1029). TIE BAR WITH: SB 0197'17
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-12 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 480 (Y: 104 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 101 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-23 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 101 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-23 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-05 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0253'18 With Immediate Effect |
2018-09-05 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 6/28/2018 @ 2:38 Pm |
2018-09-05 | Senate | Approved By Governor 6/27/2018 @ 10:22 Pm |
2018-07-25 | Senate | Presented To Governor 6/25/2018 @ 2:06 Pm |
2018-06-12 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2018-06-12 | Senate | Full Title Agreed To |
2018-06-12 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2018-06-12 | House | Returned To Senate |
2018-06-12 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2018-06-12 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 480 Yeas 104 Nays 5 |
2018-06-12 | House | Read A Third Time |
2018-06-07 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2018-06-07 | House | Read A Second Time |
2018-02-08 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2018-02-08 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2017-03-30 | House | Referred To Committee On Families, Children, And Seniors |
2017-03-30 | House | Read A First Time |
2017-03-30 | House | Received On 03/30/2017 |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 101 Yeas 36 Nays 0 Excused 2 Not Voting 0 |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Finance |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Marty Knollenberg |