MI SB0182 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-03 - Assigned Pa 0136'19 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-03 - Assigned Pa 0136'19 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Animals; other; definition of livestock in wildlife depredations act; modify citation. Amends sec. 2 of 2012 PA 487 (MCL 285.362). TIE BAR WITH: SB 0174'19
Title
Animals; other; definition of livestock in wildlife depredations act; modify citation. Amends sec. 2 of 2012 PA 487 (MCL 285.362). TIE BAR WITH: SB 0174'19
Sponsors
Sen. Ed McBroom [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-11-06 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 323 (Y: 107 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-06 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-24 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 281 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-22 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-06 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-24 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 281 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-22 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-03 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0136'19 With Immediate Effect |
2019-12-03 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 11/21/2019 04:28 Pm |
2019-12-03 | Senate | Approved By Governor 11/21/2019 10:57 Am |
2019-11-20 | Senate | Presented To Governor 11/14/2019 01:58 Pm |
2019-11-07 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2019-10-24 | Senate | Full Title Agreed To |
2019-11-07 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2019-11-06 | House | Returned To Senate |
2019-11-06 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2019-11-06 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 323 Yeas 107 Nays 3 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2019-11-06 | House | Read A Third Time |
2019-11-06 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2019-11-06 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2019-11-06 | House | Read A Second Time |
2019-11-06 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2019-11-06 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2019-10-30 | House | Referred To Committee On Ways And Means |
2019-10-24 | House | Referred To Committee On Agriculture |
2019-10-24 | House | Read A First Time |
2019-10-24 | House | Received On 10/24/2019 |
2019-10-24 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 281 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2019-10-23 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-1) |
2019-10-23 | Senate | Substitute (s-1) Concurred In |
2019-10-23 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-1) |
2019-10-22 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-1) |
2019-10-22 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2019-10-22 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute (s-1) |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Agriculture |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Ed Mcbroom |