MI SB0178 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-10-11 - Assigned Pa 0198'22 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-10-11 - Assigned Pa 0198'22 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Trade: containers; reimbursement for overredemption of beverage containers; modify process. Amends secs. 3a, 3b & 3c of 1976 IL 1 (MCL 445.473a et seq.).
Title
Trade: containers; reimbursement for overredemption of beverage containers; modify process. Amends secs. 3a, 3b & 3c of 1976 IL 1 (MCL 445.473a et seq.).
Sponsors
Sen. Ed McBroom [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-09-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Roll Call: Roll Call # 406 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 249 (Y: 104 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed By 3/4 Vote Roll Call # 45 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 249 (Y: 104 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed By 3/4 Vote Roll Call # 45 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-10-11 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0198'22 With Immediate Effect |
2022-10-11 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 10/07/2022 04:54 Pm |
2022-10-11 | Senate | Approved By Governor 10/07/2022 03:34 Pm |
2022-09-27 | Senate | Presented To Governor 09/26/2022 01:29 Pm |
2022-09-20 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2022-09-20 | Senate | Title Amendment Agreed To |
2022-09-20 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2022-09-20 | Senate | Roll Call: Roll Call # 406 Yeas 35 Nays 0 Excused 2 Not Voting 1 |
2022-09-20 | Senate | House Substitute (h-2) Concurred In |
2022-05-24 | Senate | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2022-05-19 | House | Returned To Senate |
2022-05-19 | House | Title Amended |
2022-05-19 | House | Passed By 3/4 Vote; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 249 Yeas 104 Nays 1 Excused 0 Not Voting 5 |
2022-05-19 | House | Read A Third Time |
2022-05-18 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2022-05-18 | House | Substitute (h-2) Adopted |
2022-05-18 | House | Substitute (h-1) Adopted |
2022-05-18 | House | Read A Second Time |
2021-05-25 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2021-05-25 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-1) |
2021-03-10 | House | Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform |
2021-03-10 | House | Read A First Time |
2021-03-10 | House | Received On 03/10/2021 |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Passed By 3/4 Vote Roll Call # 45 Yeas 35 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Natural Resources |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Ed Mcbroom |