MI SB0174 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-03 - Assigned Pa 0132'19 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-03 - Assigned Pa 0132'19 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Animals; other; animal industry act; modify. Amends title & secs. 1, 3, 7, 9, 11b, 12, 14, 19, 20, 22, 31, 39, 40, 43, 44 & 46 of 1988 PA 466 (MCL 287.701 et seq.); adds secs. 3a, 3b, 12a, 12b, 14a, 17b, 17c, 17d, 40a, 40b & 43a & repeals secs. 4, 5, 6, 8, 10, 13, 13a, 15, 16, 17a, 23, 24, 24a, 26a, 27, 28, 29, 29a, 30, 30a, 30b, 30c, 30d, 32, 33, 35 & 41 of 1988 PA 466 (MCL 287.704 et seq.).
Title
Animals; other; animal industry act; modify. Amends title & secs. 1, 3, 7, 9, 11b, 12, 14, 19, 20, 22, 31, 39, 40, 43, 44 & 46 of 1988 PA 466 (MCL 287.701 et seq.); adds secs. 3a, 3b, 12a, 12b, 14a, 17b, 17c, 17d, 40a, 40b & 43a & repeals secs. 4, 5, 6, 8, 10, 13, 13a, 15, 16, 17a, 23, 24, 24a, 26a, 27, 28, 29, 29a, 30, 30a, 30b, 30c, 30d, 32, 33, 35 & 41 of 1988 PA 466 (MCL 287.704 et seq.).
Sponsors
Sen. Kevin Daley [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-11-07 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: House Amendment(s) Concurred In Roll Call # 300 (Y: 33 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-11-06 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 326 (Y: 74 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-06 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Amendment(s) (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-24 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 277 (Y: 21 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-22 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-06 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 326 (Y: 74 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-06 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Amendment(s) (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-24 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 277 (Y: 21 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-22 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-03 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0132'19 With Immediate Effect |
2019-12-03 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 11/21/2019 04:20 Pm |
2019-12-03 | Senate | Approved By Governor 11/21/2019 10:49 Am |
2019-11-20 | Senate | Presented To Governor 11/14/2019 01:50 Pm |
2019-11-07 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2019-10-24 | Senate | Full Title Agreed To |
2019-11-07 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2019-11-07 | Senate | House Amendment(s) Concurred In Roll Call # 300 Yeas 33 Nays 3 Excused 2 Not Voting 0 |
2019-11-06 | House | Returned To Senate |
2019-11-06 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2019-11-06 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 326 Yeas 74 Nays 36 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2019-11-06 | House | Read A Third Time |
2019-11-06 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2019-11-06 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2019-11-06 | House | Amended |
2019-11-06 | House | Read A Second Time |
2019-11-06 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2019-11-06 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Amendment(s) |
2019-10-30 | House | Referred To Committee On Ways And Means |
2019-10-24 | House | Referred To Committee On Agriculture |
2019-10-24 | House | Read A First Time |
2019-10-24 | House | Received On 10/24/2019 |
2019-10-24 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 277 Yeas 21 Nays 17 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2019-10-23 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-2) |
2019-10-23 | Senate | Substitute (s-2) Concurred In |
2019-10-23 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-2) |
2019-10-22 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-2) |
2019-10-22 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2019-10-22 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute (s-2) |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Agriculture |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Kevin Daley |