MI SB0173 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on June 25 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-07-22 - Presented To Governor 06/30/2020 10:53 Am
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Vehicles; wreckers; incentives for or from local governments for wrecker, recovery, or towing services; prohibit. Amends sec. 676d of 1949 PA 300 (MCL 257.676d).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Vehicles; wreckers; incentives for or from local governments for wrecker, recovery, or towing services; prohibit. Amends sec. 676d of 1949 PA 300 (MCL 257.676d).

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-24 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 263 (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-03 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 26 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-22SenatePresented To Governor 06/30/2020 10:53 Am
2020-06-25SenateOrdered Enrolled
2020-06-25SenateFull Title Agreed To
2020-06-25SenateGiven Immediate Effect
2020-06-24HouseReturned To Senate
2020-06-24HouseInserted Full Title
2020-06-24HousePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 263 Yeas 108 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 1
2020-06-24HouseRead A Third Time
2020-06-10HousePlaced On Third Reading
2020-06-10HouseRead A Second Time
2020-06-03HouseReferred To Second Reading
2020-06-03HouseReported With Recommendation Without Amendment
2019-09-18HouseReferred To Committee On Ways And Means
2019-04-23HouseReferred To Committee On Local Government And Municipal Finance
2019-04-23HouseRead A First Time
2019-04-23HouseReceived On 04/23/2019
2019-04-23SenatePassed Roll Call # 26 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
2019-04-18SenatePlaced On Order Of Third Reading
2019-04-18SenateReported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s)
2019-04-16SenateReferred To Committee Of The Whole
2019-04-16SenateCommittee Recommended Immediate Effect
2019-04-16SenateReported Favorably Without Amendment
2019-03-07SenateReferred To Committee On Local Government
2019-03-07SenateIntroduced By Senator Jim Stamas

Subjects


Michigan State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2019-SB-0173
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/billintroduced/Senate/htm/2019-SIB-0173.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/billengrossed/Senate/htm/2019-SEBS-0173.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/billengrossed/Senate/htm/2019-SEBH-0173.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/billenrolled/Senate/htm/2019-SNB-0173.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/Journal/Senate/htm/2019-SJ-04-16-034.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/Journal/Senate/htm/2019-SJ-04-23-037.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/Journal/House/htm/2020-HJ-06-03-049.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/Journal/House/htm/2020-HJ-06-24-058.htm

Bill Comments

feedback