MI SB0166 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-12-28 - Assigned Pa 0248'17 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-12-28 - Assigned Pa 0248'17 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Health occupations; health professionals; prescribers to register with the Michigan automated prescription system (MAPS) and obtain a report from MAPS before prescribing or dispensing a controlled substance; require. Amends sec. 7303a of 1978 PA 368 (MCL 333.7303a). TIE BAR WITH: SB 0167'17
Title
Health occupations; health professionals; prescribers to register with the Michigan automated prescription system (MAPS) and obtain a report from MAPS before prescribing or dispensing a controlled substance; require. Amends sec. 7303a of 1978 PA 368 (MCL 333.7303a). TIE BAR WITH: SB 0167'17
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-12-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Roll Call # 562 (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-12-13 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 479 (Y: 86 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-04 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 16 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-22 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 296 (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-13 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 479 (Y: 86 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-04 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 16 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-22 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 296 (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-12-28 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0248'17 With Immediate Effect |
2017-12-28 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/27/2017 @ 2:20 Pm |
2017-12-28 | Senate | Approved By Governor 12/27/2017 @ 12:10 Pm |
2017-12-28 | Senate | Presented To Governor 12/19/2017 @ 9:30 Am |
2017-12-13 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2017-12-13 | Senate | Full Title Agreed To |
2017-12-13 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2017-12-13 | Senate | Roll Call # 562 Yeas 36 Nays 1 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2017-12-13 | Senate | House Substitute H-3 Concurred In |
2017-12-13 | House | Returned To Senate |
2017-12-13 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2017-12-13 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 479 Yeas 86 Nays 24 |
2017-12-13 | House | Read A Third Time |
2017-12-06 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2017-12-06 | House | Substitute H-3 Adopted |
2017-12-06 | House | Substitute H-2 Not Adopted |
2017-12-06 | House | Read A Second Time |
2017-10-04 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2017-10-04 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 |
2017-07-12 | House | Referred To Committee On Health Policy |
2017-07-12 | House | Read A First Time |
2017-07-12 | House | Received On 06/22/2017 |
2017-06-22 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 296 Yeas 36 Nays 1 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2017-06-21 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1 |
2017-06-21 | Senate | Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2017-06-21 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2017-06-07 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 |
2017-06-07 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2017-06-07 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Health Policy |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Tonya Schuitmaker |
Subjects
Controlled substances: narcotic drugs
Controlled substances: schedules
Health occupations: health professionals
Health: pharmaceuticals
State agencies (existing): licensing and regulatory affairs
Controlled substances: schedules
Health occupations: health professionals
Health: pharmaceuticals
State agencies (existing): licensing and regulatory affairs