MI SB0153 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Passed on November 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-11-09 - Assigned Pa 0109'21 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Passed on November 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-11-09 - Assigned Pa 0109'21 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Use tax: exemptions; sale of feminine hygiene products; exempt. Amends secs. 4 & 21 of 1937 PA 94 (MCL 205.94 & 205.111).
Title
Use tax: exemptions; sale of feminine hygiene products; exempt. Amends secs. 4 & 21 of 1937 PA 94 (MCL 205.94 & 205.111).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-11-03 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 525 (Y: 91 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-27 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 414 (Y: 32 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-10-21 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-27 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 414 (Y: 32 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-10-21 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-11-09 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0109'21 With Immediate Effect |
2021-11-09 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 11/05/2021 02:17 Pm |
2021-11-09 | Senate | Approved By Governor 11/05/2021 11:27 Am |
2021-11-09 | Senate | Presented To Governor 11/04/2021 10:50 Am |
2021-11-04 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2021-11-04 | Senate | Full Title Agreed To |
2021-11-03 | House | Returned To Senate |
2021-11-03 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2021-11-03 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 525 Yeas 91 Nays 12 Excused 0 Not Voting 6 |
2021-11-03 | House | Read A Third Time |
2021-11-02 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2021-11-02 | House | Read A Second Time |
2021-10-27 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2021-10-27 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2021-10-26 | House | Referred To Committee On Tax Policy |
2021-10-26 | House | Read A First Time |
2021-10-26 | House | Received On 10/26/2021 |
2021-10-26 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 414 Yeas 32 Nays 2 Excused 2 Not Voting 0 |
2021-10-26 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2021-10-26 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2021-10-26 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-2) |
2021-10-26 | Senate | Substitute (s-2) Concurred In |
2021-10-26 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-2) |
2021-10-21 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-2) |
2021-10-21 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute (s-2) |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Finance |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Winnie Brinks |