MI SB0153 | 2015-2016 | 98th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on October 8 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-10-08 - Referred To Committee On Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on October 8 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-10-08 - Referred To Committee On Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Traffic control; accidents; samples used for chemical analysis; expand to include urine, and expand implied consent under certain circumstances. Amends secs. 625a & 625c of 1949 PA 300 (MCL 257.625a & 257.625c).
Title
Traffic control; accidents; samples used for chemical analysis; expand to include urine, and expand implied consent under certain circumstances. Amends secs. 625a & 625c of 1949 PA 300 (MCL 257.625a & 257.625c).
Sponsors
Sen. Wayne Schmidt [R] | Sen. James Marleau [R] | Sen. John Proos [R] | Sen. Mike Nofs [R] |
Sen. Goeff Hansen [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-10-08 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 412 (Y: 30 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-04-23 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-23 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-10-08 | House | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2015-10-08 | House | Read A First Time |
2015-10-08 | House | Received On 10/08/2015 |
2015-10-08 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 412 Yeas 30 Nays 5 Excused 2 Not Voting 1 |
2015-10-08 | Senate | Amendment(s) Adopted |
2015-10-07 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-4 |
2015-10-07 | Senate | Substitute S-4 Concurred In |
2015-10-07 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-4 |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Wayne Schmidt |