MI SB0146 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 15 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-14 - Referred To Committee On Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 15 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-14 - Referred To Committee On Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriations: zero budget; school aid appropriations; provide for fiscal year 2019-2020. Amends secs. 11 & 17b of 1979 PA 94 (MCL 388.1611 & 388.1617b).
Title
Appropriations: zero budget; school aid appropriations; provide for fiscal year 2019-2020. Amends secs. 11 & 17b of 1979 PA 94 (MCL 388.1611 & 388.1617b).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-15 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 112 (Y: 21 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-3 (Y: 11 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-3 (Y: 11 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-14 | House | Referred To Committee On Appropriations |
2019-05-14 | House | Read A First Time |
2019-05-15 | House | Received On 05/15/2019 |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 112 Yeas 21 Nays 17 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Amendment(s) Defeated |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-3) As Amended |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Substitute (s-3) As Amended Concurred In |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-3) And Amendment(s) |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-3) |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute (s-3) |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Appropriations |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Wayne Schmidt |