MI SB0144 | 2023-2024 | 102nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-04-27 - Referred To Committee On Tax Policy
Pending: House Tax Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-04-27 - Referred To Committee On Tax Policy
Pending: House Tax Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Individual income tax: credit; earned income tax credit; increase. Amends 1967 PA 281 (MCL 206.1 - 206.846) by adding sec. 272a.
Title
Individual income tax: credit; earned income tax credit; increase. Amends 1967 PA 281 (MCL 206.1 - 206.846) by adding sec. 272a.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-27 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 137 (Y: 27 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-22 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-22 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-27 | House | Referred To Committee On Tax Policy |
2023-04-27 | House | Read A First Time |
2023-04-27 | House | Received On 04/27/2023 |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 137 Yeas 27 Nays 10 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Amendment(s) Defeated |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-1) |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Substitute (s-1) Concurred In |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-1) |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-1) |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute (s-1) |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Housing And Human Services |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Kristen Mcdonald Rivet |