MI SB0143 | 2013-2014 | 97th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-09-18 - Referred To Second Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-09-18 - Referred To Second Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Sales tax; definitions; definition of prewritten computer software; revise. Amends sec. 1a of 1933 PA 167 (MCL 205.51a).
Title
Sales tax; definitions; definition of prewritten computer software; revise. Amends sec. 1a of 1933 PA 167 (MCL 205.51a).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-09-18 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 321 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-06-18 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 321 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-06-18 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-09-18 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2013-09-18 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2013-06-20 | House | Referred To Committee On Tax Policy |
2013-06-20 | House | Read A First Time |
2013-06-20 | House | Received On 06/20/2013 |
2013-06-20 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 321 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2013-06-19 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1 |
2013-06-19 | Senate | Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2013-06-19 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2013-06-18 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 |
2013-06-18 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2013-06-18 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Finance |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Introduced By Senator John Pappageorge |