MI SB0139 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-22 - For Final Disposition Of Budget, See Hb 4323
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-22 - For Final Disposition Of Budget, See Hb 4323
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriations; zero budget; department of agricultural and rural development; provide for fiscal year 2017-2018. Creates appropriations act.
Title
Appropriations; zero budget; department of agricultural and rural development; provide for fiscal year 2017-2018. Creates appropriations act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-24 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Roll Call # 215 (Y: 0 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-05-17 - House - House Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 115 (Y: 63 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 131 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-17 - House - House Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 115 (Y: 63 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 131 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-22 | Senate | For Final Disposition Of Budget, See Hb 4323 |
2017-06-22 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Appropriations |
2017-06-22 | Senate | Conference Report Received In Senate |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Referred To Conference Committee 05/31/2017 |
2017-05-30 | House | House Conferees Named 05/30/2017: Reps. Roger Victory Mary Whiteford Jon Hoadley |
2017-05-30 | House | Senate Conferees Named 05/30/2017: Sens. Michael Green Jim Stamas Hoon-yung Hopgood |
2017-05-30 | House | Re-received From Senate With Notice Of Nonconcurrence In House Substitute H-1 |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Senate Named Conferees 05/30/2017: Sens. Michael Green, Jim Stamas, Hoon-yung Hopgood |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Roll Call # 215 Yeas 0 Nays 38 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2017-05-24 | Senate | House Substitute H-1 Nonconcurred In |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2017-05-17 | House | Returned To Senate |
2017-05-17 | House | Passed Roll Call # 115 Yeas 63 Nays 44 |
2017-05-17 | House | Read A Third Time |
2017-05-17 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2017-05-17 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2017-05-17 | House | Substitute H-1 Adopted |
2017-05-17 | House | Read A Second Time |
2017-05-03 | House | Placed On Second Reading |
2017-05-03 | House | Rule Suspended |
2017-05-03 | House | Read A First Time |
2017-05-03 | House | Received On 05/03/2017 |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 131 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1 |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Appropriations |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Michael Green |