MI SB0137 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 15 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-09-17 - Conference Report Received In Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Appropriations; zero budget; department of environmental quality; provide for fiscal year 2019-2020. Creates appropriation act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Appropriations; zero budget; department of environmental quality; provide for fiscal year 2019-2020. Creates appropriation act.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Defeated Roll Call # 162 (Y: 0 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-06-19 - House - House Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 154 (Y: 57 N: 52 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 17 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 80 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-09-17SenateConference Report Received In Senate
2019-06-20HouseHouse Conferees Named 07/18/2019: Reps. Sue Allor Annette Glenn John D Cherry
2019-06-20SenateSenate Named Conferees 06/20/2019: Sens. Jon Bumstead, Jim Stamas, Sean Mccann
2019-06-20SenateDefeated Roll Call # 162 Yeas 0 Nays 37 Excused 1 Not Voting 0
2019-06-20SenateHouse Substitute (h-1) Nonconcurred In
2019-06-19HouseReturned To Senate
2019-06-19HouseTitle Amended
2019-06-19HousePassed Roll Call # 154 Yeas 57 Nays 52 Excused 0 Not Voting 1
2019-06-19HouseRead A Third Time
2019-06-19HousePlaced On Immediate Passage
2019-06-19HousePlaced On Third Reading
2019-06-19HouseSubstitute (h-1) Adopted
2019-06-19HouseRead A Second Time
2019-06-19HouseReferred To Second Reading
2019-06-19HouseReported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-1)
2019-05-15HouseReferred To Committee On Appropriations
2019-05-15HouseRead A First Time
2019-05-15HouseReceived On 05/15/2019
2019-05-15SenatePassed Roll Call # 80 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
2019-05-15SenateAmendment(s) Defeated
2019-05-14SenatePlaced On Immediate Passage
2019-05-15SenateRules Suspended
2019-05-14SenatePlaced On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-2)
2019-05-14SenateSubstitute (s-2) Concurred In
2019-05-14SenateReported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-2)
2019-05-07SenateReferred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-2)
2019-05-07SenateCommittee Recommended Immediate Effect
2019-05-07SenateReported Favorably With Substitute (s-2)
2019-02-28SenateReferred To Committee On Appropriations
2019-02-28SenateIntroduced By Senator Jon Bumstead

Subjects


Michigan State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback