MI SB0134 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 20 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-20 - Assigned Pa 0147'22 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 20 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-20 - Assigned Pa 0147'22 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Crimes: fraud; manufacture, advertisement, sale, or distribution of synthetic urine or adulterant for purposes of defrauding urine drug test; prohibit. Amends 1931 PA 328 (MCL 750.1 - 750.568) by adding sec. 410c.
Title
Crimes: fraud; manufacture, advertisement, sale, or distribution of synthetic urine or adulterant for purposes of defrauding urine drug test; prohibit. Amends 1931 PA 328 (MCL 750.1 - 750.568) by adding sec. 410c.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-07-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Roll Call: Roll Call # 401 (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-30 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 357 (Y: 96 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-07 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 95 (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-30 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 357 (Y: 96 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-07 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 95 (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-20 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0147'22 With Immediate Effect |
2022-07-20 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 07/19/2022 11:54 Am |
2022-07-20 | Senate | Approved By Governor 07/19/2022 09:32 Am |
2022-07-20 | Senate | Presented To Governor 07/07/2022 11:14 Am |
2022-07-01 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2022-07-01 | Senate | Full Title Agreed To |
2022-07-01 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2022-07-01 | Senate | Roll Call: Roll Call # 401 Yeas 36 Nays 1 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2022-07-01 | Senate | House Substitute (h-1) Concurred In |
2022-06-30 | House | Returned To Senate |
2022-06-30 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2022-06-30 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 357 Yeas 96 Nays 10 Excused 0 Not Voting 4 |
2022-06-30 | House | Read A Third Time |
2022-06-30 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2022-06-30 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2022-06-30 | House | Substitute (h-1) Adopted |
2022-06-30 | House | Read A Second Time |
2022-06-07 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2022-06-07 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-1) |
2022-05-26 | House | Referred To Committee On Judiciary, With Substitute (h-1) |
2021-04-21 | House | Referred To Committee On Health Policy |
2021-04-21 | House | Read A First Time |
2021-04-21 | House | Received On 04/21/2021 |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 95 Yeas 33 Nays 1 Excused 2 Not Voting 0 |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-1) |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Substitute (s-1) Concurred In |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-1) |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-1) |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute (s-1) |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Health Policy And Human Services |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Curtis S. Vanderwall |