MI SB0132 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-21 - Assigned Pa 0213'20 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-21 - Assigned Pa 0213'20 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Highways: memorial; portion of US-12; designate as the "Trooper Rodger M. Adams Memorial Highway". Amends secs. 12 & 48 of 2001 PA 142 (MCL 250.1012 & 250.1048) & adds sec. 1085.
Title
Highways: memorial; portion of US-12; designate as the "Trooper Rodger M. Adams Memorial Highway". Amends secs. 12 & 48 of 2001 PA 142 (MCL 250.1012 & 250.1048) & adds sec. 1085.
Sponsors
Rep. Dale Zorn [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-09-23 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 399 (Y: 103 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-11 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 367 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-05 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-11 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 367 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-05 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-21 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0213'20 With Immediate Effect |
2020-10-21 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 10/15/2020 12:38 Pm |
2020-10-21 | Senate | Approved By Governor 10/15/2020 10:08 Am |
2020-10-06 | Senate | Presented To Governor 10/05/2020 11:22 Am |
2020-09-24 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2020-09-24 | Senate | Full Title Agreed To |
2020-09-24 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2020-09-23 | House | Returned To Senate |
2020-09-23 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2020-09-23 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 399 Yeas 103 Nays 2 Excused 0 Not Voting 4 |
2020-09-23 | House | Read A Third Time |
2020-09-16 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2020-09-16 | House | Read A Second Time |
2020-09-09 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2020-09-09 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2020-06-23 | House | Referred To Committee On Ways And Means |
2019-12-11 | House | Referred To Committee On Transportation |
2019-12-11 | House | Read A First Time |
2019-12-11 | House | Received On 12/11/2019 |
2019-12-11 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 367 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2019-12-11 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2019-12-11 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2019-12-11 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2019-12-11 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2019-12-05 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2019-12-05 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2019-12-05 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Transportation And Infrastructure |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Dale Zorn |