MI SB0130 | 2009-2010 | 95th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-27 - Assigned Pa 0055'10 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-27 - Assigned Pa 0055'10 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Elections; school; canvass of school district elections when school district lies in more than 1 county; amend. Amends sec. 307 of 1954 PA 116 (MCL 168.307). TIE BAR WITH: SB 0129'09, SB 0455'09
Title
Elections; school; canvass of school district elections when school district lies in more than 1 county; amend. Amends sec. 307 of 1954 PA 116 (MCL 168.307). TIE BAR WITH: SB 0129'09, SB 0455'09
Sponsors
Sen. Patricia Birkholz [R] | Sen. Cameron Brown [R] | Sen. Bill Hardiman [R] | Sen. Mark Jansen [R] |
Sen. John Pappageorge [R] | Sen. Randy Richardville [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-27 | Assigned Pa 0055'10 With Immediate Effect | |
2010-04-27 | Filed With Secretary Of State 4/22/2010 @ 2:03 Pm | |
2010-04-27 | Approved By Governor 4/22/2010 @ 10:52 Am | |
2010-04-21 | Presented To Governor 4/20/2010 @ 10:28 Am | |
2010-04-14 | Ordered Enrolled | |
2010-04-14 | Full Title Agreed To | |
2010-04-14 | Given Immediate Effect | |
2010-04-14 | House Inserted Full Title | |
2010-04-13 | Returned To Senate | |
2010-04-13 | Inserted Full Title | |
2010-04-13 | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 134 Yeas 107 Nays 0 | |
2010-04-13 | Read A Third Time | |
2010-04-13 | Placed On Immediate Passage | |
2010-04-13 | Placed On Third Reading | |
2010-04-13 | Read A Second Time | |
2010-02-17 | Referred To Second Reading | |
2010-02-17 | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment | |
2009-04-30 | Referred To Committee On Ethics And Elections | |
2009-04-30 | Read A First Time | |
2009-04-30 | Received On 04/30/2009 | |
2009-04-30 | Passed Roll Call # 138 Yeas 36 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 | |
2009-04-29 | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1 | |
2009-04-29 | Substitute S-1 Concurred In | |
2009-04-29 | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1 | |
2009-03-31 | Referred To Committee Of The Whole | |
2009-03-31 | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect | |
2009-03-31 | Reported Favorably Without Amendment | |
2009-01-28 | Referred To Committee On Education |