MI SB0129 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Assigned Pa 0020'22
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Assigned Pa 0020'22
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Businesses: associations; summer resort and park associations; modify. Amends title & secs. 3, 9, 10 & 23 of 1897 PA 230 (MCL 455.3 et seq.).
Title
Businesses: associations; summer resort and park associations; modify. Amends title & secs. 3, 9, 10 & 23 of 1897 PA 230 (MCL 455.3 et seq.).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-23 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 69 (Y: 104 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-08 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-09 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 257 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-08 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-09 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 257 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0020'22 |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 03/10/2022 11:16 Am |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Approved By Governor 03/10/2022 10:02 Am |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Presented To Governor 02/28/2022 01:33 Pm |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2022-02-23 | House | Returned To Senate |
2022-02-23 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 69 Yeas 104 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 2 |
2022-02-23 | House | Read A Third Time |
2022-02-22 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2022-02-22 | House | Read A Second Time |
2021-12-08 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2021-12-08 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2021-06-09 | House | Referred To Committee On Local Government And Municipal Finance |
2021-06-09 | House | Read A First Time |
2021-06-09 | House | Received On 06/09/2021 |
2021-06-09 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 257 Yeas 35 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2021-06-08 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2021-06-08 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Economic And Small Business Development |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Wayne A. Schmidt |