MI SB0125 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-07 - Assigned Pa 0079'20 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Property; abandoned; unclaimed property of active duty military; modify requirements for extended dormancy periods. Amends sec. 18 of 1995 PA 29 (MCL 567.238).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Property; abandoned; unclaimed property of active duty military; modify requirements for extended dormancy periods. Amends sec. 18 of 1995 PA 29 (MCL 567.238).

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-17 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Roll Call: Roll Call # 116 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-17 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 171 (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-05 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 335 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-10-31 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-07SenateAssigned Pa 0079'20 With Immediate Effect
2020-04-07SenateFiled With Secretary Of State 04/02/2020 10:08 Am
2020-04-07SenateApproved By Governor 04/02/2020 08:56 Am
2020-03-25SenatePresented To Governor 03/19/2020 12:58 Pm
2020-03-17SenateOrdered Enrolled
2020-03-17SenateFull Title Agreed To
2020-03-17SenateGiven Immediate Effect
2020-03-17SenateRoll Call: Roll Call # 116 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0
2020-03-17SenateHouse Substitute (h-1) Concurred In
2020-03-17HouseReturned To Senate
2020-03-17HouseInserted Full Title
2020-03-17HousePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 171 Yeas 92 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 18
2020-03-17HouseRead A Third Time
2020-03-17HousePlaced On Immediate Passage
2020-03-17HousePlaced On Third Reading
2020-03-17HouseSubstitute (h-1) Adopted
2020-03-17HouseRead A Second Time
2020-03-10HouseReferred To Second Reading
2020-03-10HouseReported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-1)
2020-03-03HouseReferred To Committee On Ways And Means, With Substitute (h-1)
2019-12-05HouseReferred To Committee On Military, Veterans And Homeland Security
2019-12-05HouseRead A First Time
2019-12-05HouseReceived On 12/05/2019
2019-12-05SenatePassed Roll Call # 335 Yeas 34 Nays 0 Excused 4 Not Voting 0
2019-12-05SenateSubstitute (s-3) Adopted
2019-12-04SenatePlaced On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-2)
2019-12-04SenateSubstitute (s-2) Concurred In
2019-12-04SenateReported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-2)
2019-10-31SenateReferred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-2)
2019-10-31SenateCommittee Recommended Immediate Effect
2019-10-31SenateReported Favorably With Substitute (s-2)
2019-02-26SenateReferred To Committee On Families, Seniors And Veterans
2019-02-26SenateIntroduced By Senator Tom Barrett

Subjects


Michigan State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2019-SB-0125
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/billintroduced/Senate/htm/2019-SIB-0125.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/billengrossed/Senate/htm/2019-SEBS-0125.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/billengrossed/Senate/htm/2019-SEBH-0125.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/billenrolled/Senate/htm/2019-SNB-0125.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/publicact/htm/2020-PA-0079.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/Journal/Senate/htm/2019-SJ-10-31-104.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/Journal/Senate/htm/2019-SJ-12-05-113.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/Journal/House/htm/2020-HJ-03-10-026.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/Journal/House/htm/2020-HJ-03-17-029.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/Journal/Senate/htm/2020-SJ-03-17-029.htm

Bill Comments

feedback