MI SB0125 | 2023-2024 | 102nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on July 18 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-07-18 - Assigned Pa 0066'23 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on July 18 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-07-18 - Assigned Pa 0066'23 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Transportation: railroads; local grade separation grant program and fund; create. Amends 1951 PA 51 (MCL 247.651 - 247.675) by adding sec. 11i. TIE BAR WITH: HB 4153'23
Title
Transportation: railroads; local grade separation grant program and fund; create. Amends 1951 PA 51 (MCL 247.651 - 247.675) by adding sec. 11i. TIE BAR WITH: HB 4153'23
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-27 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Roll Call: Roll Call # 387 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-14 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 150 (Y: 93 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-23 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-10 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 187 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-26 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-14 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 150 (Y: 93 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-23 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-10 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 187 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-26 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-07-18 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0066'23 With Immediate Effect |
2023-07-18 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 07/12/2023 10:24 Am |
2023-07-18 | Senate | Approved By Governor 07/11/2023 12:52 Pm |
2023-07-18 | Senate | Presented To Governor 07/06/2023 02:08 Pm |
2023-06-27 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2023-06-27 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2023-06-27 | Senate | Roll Call: Roll Call # 387 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2023-06-27 | Senate | House Substitute (h-1) Concurred In |
2023-06-14 | House | Returned To Senate |
2023-06-14 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 150 Yeas 93 Nays 16 Excused 0 Not Voting 1 |
2023-06-14 | House | Read A Third Time |
2023-06-13 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2023-06-13 | House | Substitute (h-1) Adopted |
2023-06-13 | House | Read A Second Time |
2023-05-23 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2023-05-23 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-1) |
2023-05-17 | House | Referred To Committee On Transportation, Mobility And Infrastructure |
2023-05-17 | House | Placed On Second Reading |
2023-05-17 | House | Motion To Discharge Committee Approved |
2023-05-17 | House | Rule Suspended |
2023-05-10 | House | Referred To Committee On Appropriations |
2023-05-10 | House | Read A First Time |
2023-05-10 | House | Received On 05/10/2023 |
2023-05-10 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 187 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-1) |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Substitute (s-1) Concurred In |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-1) |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-1) |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute (s-1) |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Transportation And Infrastructure |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Darrin Camilleri |
Same As/Similar To
HB4153 (Same As) 2023-07-18 - Assigned Pa 67'23 With Immediate Effect