MI SB0104 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-5)
Status: Engrossed on November 30 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-07 - Placed On Second Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on November 30 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-07 - Placed On Second Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Military affairs: other; National Guard tuition assistance program; expand eligibility for spouses. Amends title & secs. 3 & 4 of 2014 PA 259 (MCL 32.433 & 32.434).
Title
Military affairs: other; National Guard tuition assistance program; expand eligibility for spouses. Amends title & secs. 3 & 4 of 2014 PA 259 (MCL 32.433 & 32.434).
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-07 | House | Placed On Second Reading |
2022-12-07 | House | Motion To Discharge Committee Approved |
2022-12-07 | House | Rule Suspended |
2022-11-30 | House | Referred To Committee On Military, Veterans And Homeland Security |
2022-11-30 | House | Read A First Time |
2022-11-30 | House | Received On 11/30/2022 |
2022-11-29 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 503 Yeas 35 Nays 0 Excused 3 Not Voting 0 |
2022-11-29 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2022-11-29 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2022-11-29 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2022-11-29 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2022-11-29 | Senate | Placed On Order Of General Orders |
2022-11-29 | Senate | Discharge Committee Approved |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Families, Seniors, And Veterans |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Adam J. Hollier |
Subjects
Higher education: tuition
Military affairs: other
State agencies (existing): military and veterans affairs
Military affairs: other
State agencies (existing): military and veterans affairs