MI SB0103 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on October 26 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-11-30 - Placed On Third Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Public utilities: electric utilities; rights of electric transmission companies; provide for. Creates new act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public utilities: electric utilities; rights of electric transmission companies; provide for. Creates new act.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-11-10 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 411 (Y: 28 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-10-06 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-11-30HousePlaced On Third Reading
2021-11-30HouseRead A Second Time
2021-11-10HouseReferred To Second Reading
2021-11-10HouseReported With Recommendation Without Amendment
2021-10-26HouseReferred To Committee On Energy
2021-10-26HouseRead A First Time
2021-10-26HouseReceived On 10/26/2021
2021-10-26SenatePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 411 Yeas 28 Nays 6 Excused 2 Not Voting 0
2021-10-21SenatePlaced On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-2)
2021-10-21SenateSubstitute (s-2) Concurred In
2021-10-21SenateReported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-2)
2021-10-06SenateReferred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-2)
2021-10-06SenateCommittee Recommended Immediate Effect
2021-10-06SenateReported Favorably With Substitute (s-2)
2021-02-04SenateReferred To Committee On Energy And Technology
2021-02-04SenateIntroduced By Senator Wayne A. Schmidt

Subjects


Michigan State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2021-SB-0103
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billintroduced/Senate/htm/2021-SIB-0103.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billengrossed/Senate/htm/2021-SEBS-0103.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/mileg.aspx?page=CurrentVersionAmendment&cvFileName=2021-SCVBS-0103-00B74.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billanalysis/Senate/pdf/2021-SFA-0103-G.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billanalysis/Senate/pdf/2021-SFA-0103-F.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billanalysis/House/pdf/2021-HLA-0103-DC54B743.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billanalysis/House/pdf/2021-HLA-0103-0BC12FD7.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/Journal/Senate/htm/2021-SJ-10-06-077.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/Journal/Senate/htm/2021-SJ-10-26-085.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/Journal/House/htm/2021-HJ-11-10-095.htm

Bill Comments

feedback