MI SB0103 | 2009-2010 | 95th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-02-10 - Referred To Committee On Families And Children's Services
Pending: House Families And Children's Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-02-10 - Referred To Committee On Families And Children's Services
Pending: House Families And Children's Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Civil procedure; costs and fees; consolidated fees from divorce, paternity, and family support acts; provide for. Amends secs. 2137, 2529 & 2538 of 1961 PA 236 (MCL 600.2137 et seq.). TIE BAR WITH: SB 0105'09, SB 0106'09, SB 0107'09
Title
Civil procedure; costs and fees; consolidated fees from divorce, paternity, and family support acts; provide for. Amends secs. 2137, 2529 & 2538 of 1961 PA 236 (MCL 600.2137 et seq.). TIE BAR WITH: SB 0105'09, SB 0106'09, SB 0107'09
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-02-03 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-02-10 | Referred To Committee On Families And Children's Services | |
2009-02-10 | Read A First Time | |
2009-02-10 | Received On 02/10/2009 | |
2009-02-10 | Passed Roll Call # 14 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 | |
2009-02-05 | Placed On Order Of Third Reading | |
2009-02-05 | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) | |
2009-02-03 | Referred To Committee Of The Whole | |
2009-02-03 | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect | |
2009-02-03 | Reported Favorably Without Amendment | |
2009-01-28 | Referred To Committee On Families And Human Services |
Subjects
Civil procedure, costs and fees
Family law, child support
Family law, marriage and divorce
Family law, paternity
Family law, child support
Family law, marriage and divorce
Family law, paternity