MI SB0097 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Passed on November 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-05 - Assigned Pa 0111'19
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Passed on November 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-05 - Assigned Pa 0111'19
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Juveniles; other; detention of juveniles in certain circumstances; modify. Amends secs. 14 & 15, ch. XIIA of 1939 PA 288 (MCL 712A.14 & 712A.15).
Title
Juveniles; other; detention of juveniles in certain circumstances; modify. Amends secs. 14 & 15, ch. XIIA of 1939 PA 288 (MCL 712A.14 & 712A.15).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-10-16 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Roll Call: Roll Call # 262 (Y: 35 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-15 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 267 (Y: 102 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 36 (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-15 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 267 (Y: 102 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 36 (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-05 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0111'19 |
2019-11-05 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 10/31/2019 02:08 Pm |
2019-11-05 | Senate | Approved By Governor 10/31/2019 09:42 Am |
2019-10-22 | Senate | Presented To Governor 10/21/2019 02:45 Pm |
2019-10-16 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2019-10-16 | Senate | Title Amendment Agreed To |
2019-10-16 | Senate | Immediate Effect Defeated |
2019-10-16 | Senate | Roll Call: Roll Call # 262 Yeas 35 Nays 3 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2019-10-16 | Senate | House Substitute (h-1) Concurred In |
2019-10-15 | House | Returned To Senate |
2019-10-15 | House | Title Amended |
2019-10-15 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 267 Yeas 102 Nays 6 Excused 0 Not Voting 2 |
2019-10-15 | House | Read A Third Time |
2019-10-15 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2019-10-15 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2019-10-15 | House | Substitute (h-1) Adopted |
2019-10-15 | House | Read A Second Time |
2019-04-23 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2019-04-23 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-1) |
2019-04-24 | House | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2019-04-24 | House | Read A First Time |
2019-04-24 | House | Received On 04/24/2019 |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 36 Yeas 37 Nays 1 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-1) |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Substitute (s-1) Concurred In |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-1) |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-1) |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute (s-1) |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Judiciary And Public Safety |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Curtis Hertel |