MI SB0082 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-30 - Postponed For The Day
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Appropriations: omnibus; appropriations for multiple departments and branches; provide for fiscal year 2021-2022, and make supplemental appropriations for fiscal year 2020-2021. Creates appropriation act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Appropriations: omnibus; appropriations for multiple departments and branches; provide for fiscal year 2021-2022, and make supplemental appropriations for fiscal year 2020-2021. Creates appropriation act.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-09-22 - House - House Third Reading: Conference Report Adopted Roll Call # 442 (Y: 99 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-21 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Senate Adopted Conference Report With Immediate Effect Roll Call # 351 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Defeated Roll Call # 216 (Y: 0 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-05-20 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 221 (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 136 (Y: 20 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-06 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-3 (Y: 12 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-09-30SenatePostponed For The Day
2021-09-30SenateAssigned Pa 0087'21 With Immediate Effect
2021-09-30SenateFiled With Secretary Of State 09/29/2021 11:00 Am
2021-09-30SenateApproved By Governor With Line Item(s) Vetoed 09/29/2021 10:04 Am
2021-09-28SenatePresented To Governor 09/27/2021 09:44 Am
2021-09-22SenateOrdered Enrolled
2021-09-22HouseReturned To Senate
2021-09-22HouseConference Report Adopted Roll Call # 442 Yeas 99 Nays 6 Excused 0 Not Voting 5
2021-09-21HouseConference Report Received
2021-09-21SenateSenate Adopted Conference Report With Immediate Effect Roll Call # 351 Yeas 35 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0
2021-09-21SenateConference Report Received In Senate
2021-09-21SenateSen. Curtis Hertel, Jr. Replaced Sen. Jeff Irwin As Conferee 09/21/2021
2021-09-21HouseRep. Joe Tate Replaced Rep. Terry Sabo As Conferee 09/20/2021
2021-09-21HouseRep. Thomas Albert Replaced Rep. Ann Bollin As Conferee 09/20/2021
2021-06-10SenateReferred To Conference Committee
2021-06-08HouseHouse Conferees Named 06/08/2021: Reps. Greg Vanwoerkom Ann Bollin Terry J. Sabo
2021-05-27SenateSenate Named Conferees 05/27/2021: Sens. Roger Victory, Jim Stamas, Jeff Irwin
2021-05-26SenateDefeated Roll Call # 216 Yeas 0 Nays 36 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
2021-05-26SenateHouse Substitute (h-1) Nonconcurred In
2021-05-25SenateLaid Over One Day Under The Rules
2021-05-20HouseReturned To Senate
2021-05-20HouseTitle Amended
2021-05-20HousePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 221 Yeas 108 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 2
2021-05-20HouseRead A Third Time
2021-05-19HousePlaced On Third Reading
2021-05-19HouseSubstitute (h-1) Adopted
2021-05-19HouseRead A Second Time
2021-05-13HousePlaced On Second Reading
2021-05-13HouseRule Suspended
2021-05-13HouseRead A First Time
2021-05-12HouseReceived On 05/12/2021
2021-05-11SenatePassed Roll Call # 136 Yeas 20 Nays 15 Excused 1 Not Voting 0
2021-05-11SenateAmendment(s) Defeated
2021-05-11SenateAmendment(s) Adopted
2021-05-11SenatePlaced On Immediate Passage
2021-05-11SenateRules Suspended
2021-05-11SenatePlaced On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-3) As Amended
2021-05-11SenateSubstitute (s-3) As Amended Concurred In
2021-05-11SenateReported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-3) And Amendment(s)
2021-05-06SenateReferred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-3)
2021-05-06SenateCommittee Recommended Immediate Effect
2021-05-06SenateReported Favorably With Substitute (s-3)
2021-02-02SenateReferred To Committee On Appropriations
2021-02-02SenateIntroduced By Senator Roger Victory

Subjects


Michigan State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2021-SB-0082
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billintroduced/Senate/htm/2021-SIB-0082.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billengrossed/Senate/htm/2021-SEBS-0082.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billengrossed/Senate/htm/2021-SEBH-0082.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billenrolled/Senate/htm/2021-SNB-0082.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/publicact/htm/2021-PA-0087.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/mileg.aspx?page=CurrentVersionAmendment&cvFileName=2021-SCVBS-0082-00B74.pdf
Amendmenthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/mileg.aspx?page=CurrentVersionAmendment&cvFileName=2021-SCVBS-0082-0O3322.pdf
Amendmenthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/mileg.aspx?page=CurrentVersionAmendment&cvFileName=2021-SCVBS-0082-0C107.pdf
Amendmenthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/mileg.aspx?page=CurrentVersionAmendment&cvFileName=2021-SCVBS-0082-00I552.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billanalysis/Senate/pdf/2021-SFA-0082-S.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billanalysis/Senate/pdf/2021-SFA-0082-F.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billanalysis/Senate/pdf/2021-SFA-0082-U.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billanalysis/House/pdf/2021-HLA-0082-325411D8.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billanalysis/House/pdf/2021-HLA-0082-36AC529E.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billanalysis/Senate/pdf/2021-SFA-0082-R.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billanalysis/Senate/pdf/2021-SFA-0082-N.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/Journal/Senate/htm/2021-SJ-05-06-040.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/Journal/Senate/htm/2021-SJ-05-11-041.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/Journal/House/htm/2021-HJ-05-20-046.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/Journal/Senate/htm/2021-SJ-05-26-048.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/Journal/Senate/htm/2021-SJ-09-21-071.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/Journal/House/htm/2021-HJ-09-22-074.htm

Bill Comments

feedback