MI SB0066 | 2023-2024 | 102nd Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Passed on July 18 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-07-18 - Assigned Pa 0057'23 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Education: students; information regarding sexual assault and harassment; require schools to provide to students and encourage related professional development. Amends 1976 PA 451 (MCL 380.1 - 380.1852) by adding secs. 1508 & 1526b.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Education: students; information regarding sexual assault and harassment; require schools to provide to students and encourage related professional development. Amends 1976 PA 451 (MCL 380.1 - 380.1852) by adding secs. 1508 & 1526b.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-06-21 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 193 (Y: 105 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-13 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-04 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 148 (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-07-18SenateAssigned Pa 0057'23 With Immediate Effect
2023-07-18SenateFiled With Secretary Of State 07/12/2023 10:06 Am
2023-07-18SenateApproved By Governor 07/11/2023 12:34 Pm
2023-07-18SenatePresented To Governor 07/06/2023 01:52 Pm
2023-06-27SenateOrdered Enrolled
2023-06-27SenateFull Title Agreed To
2023-06-27SenateGiven Immediate Effect
2023-06-21HouseReturned To Senate
2023-06-21HouseInserted Full Title
2023-06-21HousePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 193 Yeas 105 Nays 4 Excused 0 Not Voting 1
2023-06-21HouseRead A Third Time
2023-06-20HousePlaced On Third Reading
2023-06-20HouseRead A Second Time
2023-06-13HouseReferred To Second Reading
2023-06-13HouseReported With Recommendation Without Amendment
2023-05-04HouseReferred To Committee On Criminal Justice
2023-05-04HouseRead A First Time
2023-05-04HouseReceived On 05/04/2023
2023-05-04SenatePassed Roll Call # 148 Yeas 37 Nays 1 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
2023-05-03SenatePlaced On Order Of Third Reading
2023-05-03SenateReported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s)
2023-04-25SenateReferred To Committee Of The Whole
2023-04-25SenateReported Favorably Without Amendment
2023-02-16SenateReferred To Committee On Civil Rights, Judiciary, And Public Safety
2023-02-16SenateIntroduced By Senator Stephanie Chang

Subjects


Michigan State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://legislature.mi.gov/Bills/Bill?ObjectName=2023-SB-0066
Texthttps://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2023-2024/billintroduced/Senate/htm/2023-SIB-0066.htm
Texthttps://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2023-2024/billengrossed/Senate/htm/2023-SEBS-0066.htm
Texthttps://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2023-2024/billengrossed/Senate/htm/2023-SEBH-0066.htm
Texthttps://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2023-2024/billenrolled/Senate/htm/2023-SNB-0066.htm
Texthttps://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2023-2024/publicact/htm/2023-PA-0057.htm
Supplementhttps://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2023-2024/billanalysis/Senate/pdf/2023-SFA-0066-G.pdf
Supplementhttps://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2023-2024/billanalysis/Senate/pdf/2023-SFA-0066-F.pdf
Supplementhttps://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2023-2024/billanalysis/House/pdf/2023-HLA-0066-3E56B356.pdf
Supplementhttps://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2023-2024/billanalysis/House/pdf/2023-HLA-0066-F1818EBB.pdf
Supplementhttps://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2023-2024/billanalysis/House/pdf/2023-HLA-0066-55DAB5A0.pdf
Supplementhttps://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2023-2024/billanalysis/House/pdf/2023-HLA-0066-0BA27D35.pdf
Supplementhttps://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2023-2024/billanalysis/Senate/pdf/2023-SFA-0066-N.pdf
Roll Callhttps://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2023-2024/Journal/Senate/htm/2023-SJ-04-25-037.htm
Roll Callhttps://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2023-2024/Journal/Senate/htm/2023-SJ-05-04-042.htm
Roll Callhttps://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2023-2024/Journal/House/htm/2023-HJ-06-13-054.htm
Roll Callhttps://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2023-2024/Journal/House/htm/2023-HJ-06-21-058.htm

Bill Comments

feedback