MI SB0066 | 2013-2014 | 97th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-10-02 - Assigned Pa 0288'14
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-10-02 - Assigned Pa 0288'14
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Education; graduation requirements; information to help school districts comply with Michigan merit curriculum requirements; provide for. Amends 1976 PA 451 (MCL 380.1 - 380.1852) by adding sec. 1278c.
Title
Education; graduation requirements; information to help school districts comply with Michigan merit curriculum requirements; provide for. Amends 1976 PA 451 (MCL 380.1 - 380.1852) by adding sec. 1278c.
Sponsors
Sen. John Proos [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-09-23 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: House Amendment(s) Concurred In Roll Call # 545 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-12 - House - House Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 445 (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-04 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-28 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 323 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-12-12 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-12-12 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-12 - House - House Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 445 (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-04 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-28 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 323 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-12-12 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-12-12 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-10-02 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0288'14 |
2014-10-02 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 9/30/2014 @ 2:28 Pm |
2014-10-02 | Senate | Approved By Governor 9/30/2014 @ 12:30 Pm |
2014-09-30 | Senate | Presented To Governor 9/26/2014 @ 2:22 Pm |
2014-09-23 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2014-09-23 | Senate | Full Title Agreed To |
2014-09-23 | Senate | Immediate Effect Defeated |
2014-09-23 | Senate | House Amendment(s) Concurred In Roll Call # 545 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2014-07-16 | Senate | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2014-06-12 | House | Returned To Senate |
2014-06-12 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2014-06-12 | House | Passed Roll Call # 445 Yeas 110 Nays 0 |
2014-06-12 | House | Read A Third Time |
2014-06-12 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2014-06-12 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2014-06-12 | House | Amended |
2014-06-12 | House | Read A Second Time |
2014-06-04 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2014-06-04 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2014-05-28 | House | Referred To Committee On Education |
2014-05-28 | House | Read A First Time |
2014-05-28 | House | Received On 05/28/2014 |
2014-05-28 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 323 Yeas 36 Nays 0 Excused 2 Not Voting 0 |
2014-05-27 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-8 |
2014-05-27 | Senate | Substitute S-8 Concurred In |
2014-05-27 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-8 |
2014-05-21 | Senate | Placed On Order Of General Orders |
2014-05-21 | Senate | Discharge Committee Approved |
2013-12-12 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Education |
2013-12-12 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-2 |
2013-12-12 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2013-12-12 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 |
2013-01-23 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Education |
2013-01-23 | Senate | Introduced By Senator John Proos |
Same As/Similar To
HB4073 (Same As) 2013-01-23 - Printed Bill Filed 01/23/2013
Subjects
Education, career and technical
Education, curriculum
Education, graduation requirements
Education, school districts
Education, curriculum
Education, graduation requirements
Education, school districts