MI SB0065 | 2011-2012 | 96th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-23 - Assigned Pa 0140'12 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-23 - Assigned Pa 0140'12 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Housing; landlord and tenants; termination of lease for certain controlled substance offenders if police report is filed; allow filing by person other than landlord. Amends sec. 34 of 1846 RS 66 (MCL 554.134). TIE BAR WITH: SB 0064'11
Title
Housing; landlord and tenants; termination of lease for certain controlled substance offenders if police report is filed; allow filing by person other than landlord. Amends sec. 34 of 1846 RS 66 (MCL 554.134). TIE BAR WITH: SB 0064'11
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-02 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 217 (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-22 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-09-07 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 472 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-06-09 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-22 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-09-07 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 472 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-06-09 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-23 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0140'12 With Immediate Effect |
2012-05-23 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 5/22/2012 @ 2:43 Pm |
2012-05-23 | Senate | Approved By Governor 5/22/2012 @ 8:34 Am |
2012-05-15 | Senate | Presented To Governor 5/10/2012 @ 3:44 Pm |
2012-05-08 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2012-05-08 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2012-05-03 | Senate | Immediate Effect Postponed |
2012-05-02 | House | Returned To Senate |
2012-05-02 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 217 Yeas 110 Nays 0 |
2012-05-02 | House | Read A Third Time |
2012-05-01 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2012-05-01 | House | Read A Second Time |
2012-03-22 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2012-03-22 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2011-09-07 | House | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2011-09-07 | House | Read A First Time |
2011-09-07 | House | Received On 09/07/2011 |
2011-09-07 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 472 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2011-08-24 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1 |
2011-08-24 | Senate | Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2011-08-24 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2011-06-09 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 |
2011-06-09 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2011-06-09 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2011-01-25 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |