MI SB0061 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 18 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-18 - Referred To Committee On Ways And Means
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 18 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-18 - Referred To Committee On Ways And Means
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Traffic control: speed restrictions; procedure for establishing certain speed limits; modify, and make other revisions. Amends sec. 627 of 1949 PA 300 (MCL 257.627).
Title
Traffic control: speed restrictions; procedure for establishing certain speed limits; modify, and make other revisions. Amends sec. 627 of 1949 PA 300 (MCL 257.627).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 22 (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-18 | House | Referred To Committee On Ways And Means |
2019-04-18 | House | Read A First Time |
2019-04-18 | House | Received On 04/18/2019 |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 22 Yeas 35 Nays 1 Excused 2 Not Voting 0 |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Transportation And Infrastructure |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Roger Victory |
Subjects
State agencies (existing): transportation
Traffic control: speed restrictions
Traffic control: traffic regulation
Traffic control: speed restrictions
Traffic control: traffic regulation