MI SB0049 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 31 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-31 - Assigned Pa 0136'17 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 31 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-31 - Assigned Pa 0136'17 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Probate; guardians and conservators; provision related to compensation for professional guardian or professional conservator; modify. Amends sec. 5106 of 1998 PA 386 (MCL 700.5106).
Title
Probate; guardians and conservators; provision related to compensation for professional guardian or professional conservator; modify. Amends sec. 5106 of 1998 PA 386 (MCL 700.5106).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-10-10 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Roll Call # 376 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-10-05 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 290 (Y: 107 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 41 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-05 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 290 (Y: 107 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 41 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-31 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0136'17 With Immediate Effect |
2017-10-31 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 10/26/2017 @ 2:24 Pm |
2017-10-31 | Senate | Approved By Governor 10/26/2017 @ 12:01 Pm |
2017-10-17 | Senate | Presented To Governor 10/16/2017 @ 11:20 Am |
2017-10-10 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2017-10-10 | Senate | Full Title Agreed To |
2017-10-10 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2017-10-10 | Senate | Roll Call # 376 Yeas 36 Nays 0 Excused 2 Not Voting 0 |
2017-10-10 | Senate | House Substitute H-4 Concurred In |
2017-10-05 | House | Returned To Senate |
2017-10-05 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2017-10-05 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 290 Yeas 107 Nays 1 |
2017-10-05 | House | Read A Third Time |
2017-10-04 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2017-10-04 | House | Substitute H-4 Adopted |
2017-10-04 | House | Substitute H-1 Not Adopted |
2017-10-04 | House | Read A Second Time |
2017-03-28 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2017-03-28 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 |
2017-02-28 | House | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2017-02-28 | House | Read A First Time |
2017-02-28 | House | Received On 02/28/2017 |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 41 Yeas 36 Nays 0 Excused 2 Not Voting 0 |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Substitute S-1 Adopted |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2017-01-18 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2017-01-18 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Darwin Booher |