MI SB0046 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Veto Override Defeated Roll Call # 189 Yeas 20 Nays 15 Excused 1 Not Voting 0
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Property tax: exemptions; eligible broadband equipment; exempt from personal property tax. Amends 1893 PA 206 (MCL 211.1 - 211. 155) by adding sec. 9p.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Property tax: exemptions; eligible broadband equipment; exempt from personal property tax. Amends 1893 PA 206 (MCL 211.1 - 211. 155) by adding sec. 9p.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Veto Override Defeated Roll Call # 189 (Y: 20 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 139 (Y: 58 N: 51 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Roll Call: Roll Call # 97 (Y: 20 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Roll Call: Roll Call # 96 (Y: 19 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 89 (Y: 57 N: 49 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 12 (Y: 20 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-18SenateVeto Override Defeated Roll Call # 189 Yeas 20 Nays 15 Excused 1 Not Voting 0
2021-05-13SenatePostponed For The Day
2021-05-13SenateVetoed By Governor 05/13/2021
2021-05-04SenatePresented To Governor 05/03/2021 09:08 Am
2021-04-28SenateOrdered Enrolled
2021-04-28SenateFull Title Agreed To
2021-04-28SenateImmediate Effect Defeated
2021-04-27HouseReturned To Senate
2021-04-27HouseRoll Call Roll Call # 139 Yeas 58 Nays 51 Excused 0 Not Voting 1
2021-04-27HouseSenate Substitute (s-3) To House Substitute (h-1) Concurred In
2021-04-21HouseLaid Over One Day Under The Rules
2021-04-21HouseRe-returned From Senate With Substitute (s-3) To House Substitute (h-1)
2021-04-21SenateRoll Call: Roll Call # 97 Yeas 20 Nays 14 Excused 2 Not Voting 0
2021-04-21SenateVote Reconsidered
2021-04-21SenateRoll Call: Roll Call # 96 Yeas 19 Nays 14 Excused 2 Not Voting 1
2021-04-21SenateHouse Substitute (h-1) Concurred In As Substituted (s-3)
2021-04-21SenateSubstitute (s-3) Adopted
2021-04-13SenateLaid Over One Day Under The Rules
2021-03-25HouseReturned To Senate
2021-03-25HouseInserted Full Title
2021-03-25HousePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 89 Yeas 57 Nays 49 Excused 0 Not Voting 4
2021-03-25HouseRead A Third Time
2021-03-24HousePlaced On Third Reading
2021-03-24HouseSubstitute (h-1) Adopted
2021-03-24HouseRead A Second Time
2021-03-09HouseReferred To Second Reading
2021-03-09HouseReported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-1)
2021-02-18HouseReferred To Committee On Communications And Technology
2021-02-18HouseRead A First Time
2021-02-18HouseReceived On 02/18/2021
2021-02-18SenatePassed Roll Call # 12 Yeas 20 Nays 15 Excused 1 Not Voting 0
2021-02-17SenatePlaced On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-1)
2021-02-17SenateSubstitute (s-1) Concurred In
2021-02-17SenateReported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-1)
2021-02-10SenateReferred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-1)
2021-02-10SenateReported Favorably With Substitute (s-1)
2021-01-26SenateReferred To Committee On Energy And Technology
2021-01-26SenateIntroduced By Senator Aric Nesbitt

Subjects


Michigan State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2021-SB-0046
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billintroduced/Senate/htm/2021-SIB-0046.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billengrossed/Senate/htm/2021-SEBS-0046.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billengrossed/Senate/htm/2021-SEBH-0046.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billenrolled/Senate/htm/2021-SNB-0046.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/mileg.aspx?page=CurrentVersionAmendment&cvFileName=2021-SCVBS-0046-00B74.pdf
Amendmenthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/mileg.aspx?page=CurrentVersionAmendment&cvFileName=2021-SCVBS-0046-0N2914.pdf
Amendmenthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/mileg.aspx?page=CurrentVersionAmendment&cvFileName=2021-SCVBS-0046-0I1043.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billanalysis/Senate/pdf/2021-SFA-0046-G.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billanalysis/Senate/pdf/2021-SFA-0046-F.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billanalysis/House/pdf/2021-HLA-0046-6277BBB0.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billanalysis/House/pdf/2021-HLA-0046-59741182.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billanalysis/House/pdf/2021-HLA-0046-343BCF94.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billanalysis/House/pdf/2021-HLA-0046-13FA790F.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/Journal/Senate/htm/2021-SJ-02-10-009.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/Journal/Senate/htm/2021-SJ-02-18-013.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/Journal/House/htm/2021-HJ-03-09-020.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/Journal/House/htm/2021-HJ-03-25-028.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/Journal/Senate/htm/2021-SJ-04-21-033.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/Journal/House/htm/2021-HJ-04-27-035.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/Journal/Senate/htm/2021-SJ-05-18-044.htm

Bill Comments

feedback