MI SB0045 | 2023-2024 | 102nd Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Engrossed on November 9 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-11-08 - Referred To Committee On Health Policy
Pending: House Health Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Health occupations: health professionals; definition of invasive bodily examination; add. Amends secs. 16105 & 16106 of 1978 PA 368 (MCL 333.16105 & 333.16106). TIE BAR WITH: SB 0044'23

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health occupations: health professionals; definition of invasive bodily examination; add. Amends secs. 16105 & 16106 of 1978 PA 368 (MCL 333.16105 & 333.16106). TIE BAR WITH: SB 0044'23

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-11-08 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 703 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-11-07 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-11-08HouseReferred To Committee On Health Policy
2023-11-08HouseRead A First Time
2023-11-09HouseReceived On 11/08/2023
2023-11-08SenatePassed Roll Call # 703 Yeas 35 Nays 0 Excused 3 Not Voting 0
2023-11-08SenatePlaced On Immediate Passage
2023-11-08SenateRules Suspended
2023-11-08SenatePlaced On Order Of Third Reading
2023-11-08SenateReported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s)
2023-11-07SenateReferred To Committee Of The Whole
2023-11-07SenateReported Favorably Without Amendment
2023-01-26SenateReferred To Committee On Health Policy
2023-01-26SenateIntroduced By Senator Sylvia Santana

Same As/Similar To

SB0044 (Same As) 2023-11-08 - Referred To Committee On Health Policy

Subjects


Michigan State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://legislature.mi.gov/Bills/Bill?ObjectName=2023-SB-0045
Texthttps://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2023-2024/billintroduced/Senate/htm/2023-SIB-0045.htm
Texthttps://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2023-2024/billengrossed/Senate/htm/2023-SEBS-0045.htm
Supplementhttps://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2023-2024/billanalysis/Senate/pdf/2023-SFA-0044-G.pdf
Supplementhttps://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2023-2024/billanalysis/Senate/pdf/2023-SFA-0044-F.pdf
Supplementhttps://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2023-2024/billanalysis/Senate/pdf/2023-SFA-0044-C.pdf
Supplementhttps://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2023-2024/billanalysis/Senate/pdf/2023-SFA-0044-U.pdf
Supplementhttps://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2023-2024/billanalysis/House/pdf/2023-HLA-0044-06AC2AD8.pdf
Roll Callhttps://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2023-2024/Journal/Senate/htm/2023-SJ-11-07-098.htm
Roll Callhttps://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2023-2024/Journal/Senate/htm/2023-SJ-11-08-099.htm

Bill Comments

feedback