MI SB0038 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-09 - Assigned Pa 0025'17 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-09 - Assigned Pa 0025'17 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Law enforcement; records; procedure for fingerprinting and photographing of individual with special health care needs taken and submitted to the automated fingerprint identification system (AFIS) and the statewide network of agency photos upon request of parent or guardian; allow and establish. Amends sec. 1 of 1935 PA 120 (MCL 28.271) & adds sec. 4.
Title
Law enforcement; records; procedure for fingerprinting and photographing of individual with special health care needs taken and submitted to the automated fingerprint identification system (AFIS) and the statewide network of agency photos upon request of parent or guardian; allow and establish. Amends sec. 1 of 1935 PA 120 (MCL 28.271) & adds sec. 4.
Sponsors
Sen. Rick Jones [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-19 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 69 (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 26 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 26 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-09 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0025'17 With Immediate Effect |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 5/4/2017 @ 3:22 Pm |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Approved By Governor 5/4/2017 @ 9:10 Am |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Presented To Governor 4/27/2017 @ 2:35 Pm |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2017-04-19 | House | Returned To Senate |
2017-04-19 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 69 Yeas 107 Nays 0 |
2017-04-19 | House | Read A Third Time |
2017-03-15 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2017-03-15 | House | Read A Second Time |
2017-03-07 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2017-03-07 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2017-02-09 | House | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2017-02-09 | House | Read A First Time |
2017-02-09 | House | Received On 02/09/2017 |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 26 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2017-01-18 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2017-01-18 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Rick Jones |