MI SB0024 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on September 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-19 - Assigned Pa 0049'19 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on September 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-19 - Assigned Pa 0049'19 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Criminal procedure: sentencing guidelines; guidelines for mail theft; establish. Amends sec. 14h, ch. XVII of 1927 PA 175 (MCL 777.14h). TIE BAR WITH: SB 0023'19
Title
Criminal procedure: sentencing guidelines; guidelines for mail theft; establish. Amends sec. 14h, ch. XVII of 1927 PA 175 (MCL 777.14h). TIE BAR WITH: SB 0023'19
Sponsors
Sen. Peter Lucido [R] | Sen. James Runestad [R] | Sen. James Ananich [D] | Sen. Tom Barrett [R] |
Sen. Michael MacDonald [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-09-04 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 183 (Y: 106 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 11 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 11 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-19 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0049'19 With Immediate Effect |
2019-09-19 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 09/17/2019 04:30 Pm |
2019-09-19 | Senate | Approved By Governor 09/17/2019 02:55 Pm |
2019-09-09 | Senate | Presented To Governor 09/09/2019 03:08 Pm |
2019-09-05 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2019-09-05 | Senate | Full Title Agreed To |
2019-09-05 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2019-09-05 | Senate | Roll Call: Roll Call # 193 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2019-09-05 | Senate | House Substitute (h-1) Concurred In |
2019-09-04 | House | Returned To Senate |
2019-09-04 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2019-09-04 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 183 Yeas 106 Nays 3 Excused 0 Not Voting 1 |
2019-09-04 | House | Read A Third Time |
2019-09-03 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2019-09-03 | House | Substitute (h-1) Adopted |
2019-09-03 | House | Read A Second Time |
2019-06-18 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2019-06-18 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-1) |
2019-02-28 | House | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2019-02-28 | House | Read A First Time |
2019-03-06 | House | Received On 03/06/2019 |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 11 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-1) |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Substitute (s-1) Concurred In |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-1) |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-1) |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute (s-1) |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Judiciary And Public Safety |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Peter Lucido |