MI SB0023 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-02-28 - Referred To Committee On Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Crimes; identity theft; mail and mail depository protection act; create. Creates new act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Crimes; identity theft; mail and mail depository protection act; create. Creates new act.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-28 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 10 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-28HouseReferred To Committee On Judiciary
2019-02-28HouseRead A First Time
2019-02-28HouseReceived On 02/28/2019
2019-02-28SenatePassed Roll Call # 10 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
2019-02-27SenatePlaced On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1
2019-02-27SenateSubstitute S-1 Concurred In
2019-02-27SenateReported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1
2019-02-19SenateReferred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1
2019-02-19SenateCommittee Recommended Immediate Effect
2019-02-19SenateReported Favorably With Substitute S-1
2019-01-15SenateReferred To Committee On Judiciary And Public Safety
2019-01-15SenateIntroduced By Senator Jim Runestad

Subjects


Michigan State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback