MI SB0019 | 2013-2014 | 97th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-17 - Assigned Pa 0014'13 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-17 - Assigned Pa 0014'13 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Financial institutions; mortgage brokers and lenders; appointments to the mortgage industry advisory board; modify. Amends sec. 33 of 1987 PA 173 (MCL 445.1683).
Title
Financial institutions; mortgage brokers and lenders; appointments to the mortgage industry advisory board; modify. Amends sec. 33 of 1987 PA 173 (MCL 445.1683).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-20 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 49 (Y: 109 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-06 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 26 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-02-12 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-06 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 26 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-02-12 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-17 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0014'13 With Immediate Effect |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 4/16/2013 @ 1:58 Pm |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Approved By Governor 4/16/2013 @ 11:50 Am |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Presented To Governor 4/3/2013 @ 11:16 Am |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Full Title Agreed To |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2013-03-21 | Senate | House Inserted Full Title |
2013-03-20 | House | Returned To Senate |
2013-03-20 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2013-03-20 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 49 Yeas 109 Nays 1 |
2013-03-20 | House | Read A Third Time |
2013-03-19 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2013-03-19 | House | Read A Second Time |
2013-03-06 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2013-03-06 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2013-02-20 | House | Referred To Committee On Financial Services |
2013-02-20 | House | Read A First Time |
2013-02-20 | House | Received On 02/20/2013 |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 26 Yeas 36 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2013-01-16 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Banking And Financial Institutions |
2013-01-16 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Darwin Booher |
Subjects
Financial institutions, mortgage brokers and lenders
State agencies (existing), licensing and regulatory affairs
State agencies (existing), licensing and regulatory affairs