MI SB0009 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 11-3)
Status: Enrolled on March 9 2017 - 75% progression
Action: 2017-03-22 - Presented To Governor 3/21/2017 @ 12:50 Pm
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Corrections; other; reentry services provided to prisoners housed in correctional institutions by certain organizations; require the department to develop screening and registration policies and procedures for those organizations. Amends 1953 PA 232 (MCL 791.201 - 791.285) by adding sec. 69b.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Corrections; other; reentry services provided to prisoners housed in correctional institutions by certain organizations; require the department to develop screening and registration policies and procedures for those organizations. Amends 1953 PA 232 (MCL 791.201 - 791.285) by adding sec. 69b.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-09 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Roll Call # 52 (Y: 28 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-08 - House of Representatives - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 15 (Y: 73 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-02 - House of Representatives - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-02 - House of Representatives - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 5 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-22SenatePresented To Governor 3/21/2017 @ 12:50 Pm
2017-03-09SenateOrdered Enrolled
2017-03-09SenateFull Title Agreed To
2017-03-09SenateGiven Immediate Effect
2017-03-09Senate Roll Call # 52 Yeas 28 Nays 7 Excused 3 Not Voting 0
2017-03-09SenateHouse Substitute H-1 Concurred In
2017-03-08HouseReturned To Senate
2017-03-08HouseInserted Full Title
2017-03-08HousePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 15 Yeas 73 Nays 34
2017-03-08HouseRead A Third Time
2017-03-07HousePlaced On Third Reading
2017-03-07HouseSubstitute H-1 Adopted
2017-03-07HouseRead A Second Time
2017-03-02HouseReferred To Second Reading
2017-03-02HouseReported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1
2017-02-02HouseReferred To Committee On Michigan Competitveness
2017-02-02HouseRead A First Time
2017-02-02HouseReceived On 02/02/2017
2017-02-02SenatePassed Roll Call # 5 Yeas 35 Nays 0 Excused 3 Not Voting 0
2017-02-01SenatePlaced On Order Of Third Reading
2017-02-01SenateReported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s)
2017-01-31SenateReferred To Committee Of The Whole
2017-01-31SenateCommittee Recommended Immediate Effect
2017-01-31SenateReported Favorably Without Amendment
2017-01-18SenateReferred To Committee On Michigan Competitiveness
2017-01-18SenateIntroduced By Senator John Proos

Subjects


Michigan State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2017-SB-0009
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/billintroduced/Senate/htm/2017-SIB-0009.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/billengrossed/Senate/htm/2017-SEBS-0009.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/billengrossed/Senate/htm/2017-SEBH-0009.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/billenrolled/Senate/htm/2017-SNB-0009.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/Senate/htm/2017-SJ-01-31-008.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/Senate/htm/2017-SJ-02-02-010.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/House/htm/2017-HJ-03-02-022.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/House/htm/2017-HJ-03-08-024.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/Senate/htm/2017-SJ-03-09-025.htm

Bill Comments

feedback