MI SB0003 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 20 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-04-09 - Presented To Governor 3/22/2019 @ 1:12 Pm
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Civil procedure; evictions; writ of restitution; allow to be executed by a court officer, bailiff, or deputy sheriff. Amends sec. 5744 of 1961 PA 236 (MCL 600.5744).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Civil procedure; evictions; writ of restitution; allow to be executed by a court officer, bailiff, or deputy sheriff. Amends sec. 5744 of 1961 PA 236 (MCL 600.5744).

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-19 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 31 (Y: 106 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 9 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-09SenatePresented To Governor 3/22/2019 @ 1:12 Pm
2019-03-20SenateOrdered Enrolled
2019-03-20SenateFull Title Agreed To
2019-03-20SenateGiven Immediate Effect
2019-03-19HouseReturned To Senate
2019-03-19HouseInserted Full Title
2019-03-19HousePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 31 Yeas 106 Nays 1
2019-03-19HouseRead A Third Time
2019-03-14HousePlaced On Third Reading
2019-03-14HouseRead A Second Time
2019-03-12HouseReferred To Second Reading
2019-03-12HouseReported With Recommendation Without Amendment
2019-02-26HouseReferred To Committee On Judiciary
2019-02-26HouseRead A First Time
2019-02-26HouseReceived On 02/26/2019
2019-02-26SenatePassed Roll Call # 9 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
2019-02-21SenatePlaced On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1
2019-02-21SenateSubstitute S-1 Concurred In
2019-02-21SenateReported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1
2019-02-19SenateReferred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1
2019-02-19SenateCommittee Recommended Immediate Effect
2019-02-19SenateReported Favorably With Substitute S-1
2019-01-15SenateReferred To Committee On Judiciary And Public Safety
2019-01-15SenateIntroduced By Senator Peter Lucido

Subjects


Michigan State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2019-SB-0003
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/billintroduced/Senate/htm/2019-SIB-0003.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/billengrossed/Senate/htm/2019-SEBS-0003.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/billengrossed/Senate/htm/2019-SEBH-0003.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/billenrolled/Senate/htm/2019-SNB-0003.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/Journal/Senate/htm/2019-SJ-02-19-016.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/Journal/Senate/htm/2019-SJ-02-26-019.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/Journal/House/htm/2019-HJ-03-12-025.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/Journal/House/htm/2019-HJ-03-19-028.htm

Bill Comments

feedback