MI HR0302 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 38-14)
Status: Passed on September 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-10 - Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 38-14)
Status: Passed on September 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-10 - Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A resolution to declare September 24, 2020, as a Day of Prayer, Fasting, and Humiliation in the state of Michigan.
Title
A resolution to declare September 24, 2020, as a Day of Prayer, Fasting, and Humiliation in the state of Michigan.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-09-09 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-10 | House | Adopted |
2020-09-09 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2020-08-17 | House | Referred To Committee On Government Operations |
2020-08-17 | House | Introduced By Representative John Reilly |