MI HJRP | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 30 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-15 - Referred To Second Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 30 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-15 - Referred To Second Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Civil rights; speech and assembly; authority of legislature to provide by law for the protection of free speech at public institutions of higher education; provide for. Amends secs. 5, 6 & 7, art. VIII & adds sec. 10 to art. VIII of the state constitution.
Title
Civil rights; speech and assembly; authority of legislature to provide by law for the protection of free speech at public institutions of higher education; provide for. Amends secs. 5, 6 & 7, art. VIII & adds sec. 10 to art. VIII of the state constitution.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-15 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-15 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2018-02-15 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2017-05-31 | House | Joint Resolution Electronically Reproduced 05/30/2017 |
2017-05-30 | House | Referred To Committee On Oversight |
2017-05-30 | House | Read A First Time |
2017-05-30 | House | Introduced By Representative Jim Runestad |
Subjects
Civil rights: speech and assembly
Constitutional amendments: state
Higher education: community colleges
Higher education: state universities
Constitutional amendments: state
Higher education: community colleges
Higher education: state universities