MI HJRA | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-25 - Referred To Committee On Government Operations
Pending: Senate Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-25 - Referred To Committee On Government Operations
Pending: Senate Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Legislature: legislators; requirements for bill passage; modify. Amends sec. 26, art. IV of the state constitution.
Title
Legislature: legislators; requirements for bill passage; modify. Amends sec. 26, art. IV of the state constitution.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-24 - House - House Third Reading: Adopted By 2/3 Vote Roll Call # 13 (Y: 102 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-25 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Government Operations |
2021-02-24 | House | Transmitted |
2021-02-24 | House | Adopted By 2/3 Vote Roll Call # 13 Yeas 102 Nays 7 Excused 0 Not Voting 1 |
2021-02-24 | House | Read A Third Time |
2021-02-23 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2021-02-23 | House | Read A Second Time |
2021-02-23 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2021-02-23 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2021-01-26 | House | Joint Resolution Electronically Reproduced 01/13/2021 |
2021-01-13 | House | Referred To Committee On Elections And Ethics |
2021-01-13 | House | Read A First Time |
2021-01-13 | House | Introduced By Representative Jason Wentworth |