MI HCR0022 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 8 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-10 - Referred To Committee On Outdoor Recreation And Tourism
Pending: Senate Outdoor Recreation And Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 8 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-10 - Referred To Committee On Outdoor Recreation And Tourism
Pending: Senate Outdoor Recreation And Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
A concurrent resolution to oppose the Michigan State Waterways Commission recommendation that legislation be introduced to require the registration with a fee of all rigid-hulled kayaks, canoes, and paddleboards eight feet or longer.
Title
A concurrent resolution to oppose the Michigan State Waterways Commission recommendation that legislation be introduced to require the registration with a fee of all rigid-hulled kayaks, canoes, and paddleboards eight feet or longer.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-02 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-10 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Outdoor Recreation And Tourism |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2018-05-08 | House | Adopted And Transmitted |
2018-05-08 | House | Substitute H-1 Adopted |
2018-05-02 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 |
2018-04-19 | House | Referred To Committee On Tourism And Outdoor Recreation |
2018-04-19 | House | Introduced By Representative Holly Hughes |