MI HCR0019 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-29 - Adopted By Senate - Referred To The Clerk For Record
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-29 - Adopted By Senate - Referred To The Clerk For Record
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
A concurrent resolution to memorialize the Congress of the United States to award the posthumous Medal of Honor to Lieutenant-Colonel Albert M. Edwards for his actions during the Civil War.
Title
A concurrent resolution to memorialize the Congress of the United States to award the posthumous Medal of Honor to Lieutenant-Colonel Albert M. Edwards for his actions during the Civil War.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-22 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-29 | House | Adopted By Senate - Referred To The Clerk For Record |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Adopted |
2018-05-22 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Resolutions |
2018-05-22 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Veterans, Military Affairs And Homeland Security |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2018-03-15 | House | Adopted And Transmitted |
2018-03-06 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2018-02-08 | House | Referred To Committee On Military And Veterans Affairs |
2018-02-08 | House | Introduced By Representative Jeff Noble |