MI HCR0015 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-24 - Adopted By Senate - Referred To The Clerk For Record
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-24 - Adopted By Senate - Referred To The Clerk For Record
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
A concurrent resolution to memorialize the Congress of the United States to take action on immigration reform.
Title
A concurrent resolution to memorialize the Congress of the United States to take action on immigration reform.
Sponsors
Rep. Jim Lilly [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-04-18 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-27 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-27 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-24 | House | Adopted By Senate - Referred To The Clerk For Record |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Adopted |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Resolutions |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2017-10-04 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Government Operations |
2017-10-03 | House | Adopted And Transmitted |
2017-09-27 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2017-09-19 | House | Referred To Committee On Michigan Competitiveness |
2017-09-19 | House | Introduced By Representative Jim Lilly |