MI HCR0008 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 6 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-07 - Referred To Committee On Education
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 6 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-07 - Referred To Committee On Education
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
A concurrent resolution to memorialize the Congress of the United States to include transportation costs as a qualified education expense under the Section 529 Qualified Tuition Program.
Title
A concurrent resolution to memorialize the Congress of the United States to include transportation costs as a qualified education expense under the Section 529 Qualified Tuition Program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-30 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-07 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Education |
2017-06-07 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2017-06-06 | House | Adopted And Transmitted |
2017-05-30 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2017-05-24 | House | Referred To Committee On Workforce And Talent Development |
2017-05-24 | House | Introduced By Representative Joseph Bellino |
Subjects
Congress of the United States
qualified education expense
Section 529 Qualified Tuition Program
transportation costs
qualified education expense
Section 529 Qualified Tuition Program
transportation costs