MI HCR0007 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Passed on July 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-23 - Referred To Committee On Health Policy And Human Services
Pending: Senate Health Policy And Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

A concurrent resolution to urge the Centers for Disease Control and Prevention and the Michigan Department of Health and Human Services to protect the people of Michigan from Lyme disease by improving efforts to prevent, monitor, diagnose, and treat the disease.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A concurrent resolution to urge the Centers for Disease Control and Prevention and the Michigan Department of Health and Human Services to protect the people of Michigan from Lyme disease by improving efforts to prevent, monitor, diagnose, and treat the disease.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-17 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 16 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-23SenateReferred To Committee On Health Policy And Human Services
2020-07-23SenateRules Suspended
2020-07-21HouseTransmitted
2020-07-21HouseAdopted
2020-06-17HouseReported With Recommendation Without Amendment
2019-05-16HouseReferred To Committee On Health Policy
2019-05-16HouseIntroduced By Representative Karen Whitsett

Subjects


Michigan State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback