MI HCR0003 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 29-4)
Status: Engrossed on April 18 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-23 - Referred To Committee On Families, Seniors And Veterans
Pending: Senate Families, Seniors And Veterans Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 18 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-23 - Referred To Committee On Families, Seniors And Veterans
Pending: Senate Families, Seniors And Veterans Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
A concurrent resolution to call on the Michigan Veterans' Facility Authority to ensure plans for the new state veterans homes include designated smoking areas.
Title
A concurrent resolution to call on the Michigan Veterans' Facility Authority to ensure plans for the new state veterans homes include designated smoking areas.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-16 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - House - Reported With Recommendation For Referral To Committee On Ways And Means (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - House - Reported With Recommendation For Referral To Committee On Ways And Means (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-23 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Families, Seniors And Veterans |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2019-04-18 | House | Adopted And Transmitted |
2019-04-16 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2019-03-12 | House | Referred To Committee On Ways And Means |
2019-02-26 | House | Referred To Committee On Military, Veterans And Homeland Security |
2019-02-26 | House | Introduced By Representative Beau Lafave |