MI HB6491 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-31 - Assigned Pa 690'18
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-31 - Assigned Pa 690'18
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Insurance; other; insurance data security model law; enact. Amends 1956 PA 218 (MCL 500.100 - 500.8302) by adding ch. 5A.
Title
Insurance; other; insurance data security model law; enact. Amends 1956 PA 218 (MCL 500.100 - 500.8302) by adding ch. 5A.
Sponsors
Sen. Lana Theis [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-12-21 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 1039 (Y: 98 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-19 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 932 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-18 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-3 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-06 - House - House Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 749 (Y: 103 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-11-29 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-19 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 932 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-18 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-3 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-06 - House - House Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 749 (Y: 103 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-11-29 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-31 | House | Assigned Pa 690'18 |
2018-12-31 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/28/2018 @ 8:12 Pm |
2018-12-31 | House | Approved By The Governor 12/28/2018 @ 7:01 Pm |
2018-12-28 | House | Presented To The Governor 12/27/2018 @ 5:28 Pm |
2018-12-21 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2018-12-21 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2018-12-21 | House | Roll Call # 1039 Yeas 98 Nays 6 |
2018-12-21 | House | Senate Substitute S-5 Concurred In |
2018-12-20 | House | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2018-12-20 | House | Returned From Senate With Substitute S-5 With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2018-12-19 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2018-12-19 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 932 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2018-12-18 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2018-12-18 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2018-12-18 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-5 |
2018-12-18 | Senate | Substitute S-5 Concurred In |
2018-12-18 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-5 |
2018-12-18 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-3 |
2018-12-18 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2018-12-18 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-3 |
2018-12-11 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Finance |
2018-12-06 | House | Transmitted |
2018-12-06 | House | Passed Roll Call # 749 Yeas 103 Nays 6 |
2018-12-06 | House | Read A Third Time |
2018-12-05 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2018-12-05 | House | Substitute H-1 Adopted |
2018-12-05 | House | Read A Second Time |
2018-11-29 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2018-11-29 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 |
2018-11-27 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 11/08/2018 |
2018-11-08 | House | Referred To Committee On Insurance |
2018-11-08 | House | Read A First Time |
2018-11-08 | House | Introduced By Representative Lana Theis |