MI HB6453 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 18 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-12-02 - Referred To Second Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Criminal procedure: expunction; eligibility for record expungement of operating while intoxicated convictions; allow. Amends sec. 1c of 1965 PA 213 (MCL 780.621c).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Criminal procedure: expunction; eligibility for record expungement of operating while intoxicated convictions; allow. Amends sec. 1c of 1965 PA 213 (MCL 780.621c).

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-12-02HouseReferred To Second Reading
2020-12-02HouseReported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-3)
2020-12-01HouseBill Electronically Reproduced 12/01/2020
2020-11-18HouseReferred To Committee On Judiciary
2020-11-18HouseRead A First Time
2020-11-18HouseIntroduced By Representative Beau Lafave

Subjects


Michigan State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback