MI HB6448 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 18 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-02 - Referred To Second Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 18 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-02 - Referred To Second Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Labor: fair employment practices; requirement that an employee not report to work if the employee tests positive for COVID-19 or displays a principal symptom of COVID-19; exempt essential critical energy infrastructure workers from. Amends secs. 1 & 5 of 2020 PA 238 (MCL 419.401 & 419.405).
Title
Labor: fair employment practices; requirement that an employee not report to work if the employee tests positive for COVID-19 or displays a principal symptom of COVID-19; exempt essential critical energy infrastructure workers from. Amends secs. 1 & 5 of 2020 PA 238 (MCL 419.401 & 419.405).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-12-02 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-02 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2020-12-02 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2020-12-01 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 12/01/2020 |
2020-11-18 | House | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2020-11-18 | House | Read A First Time |
2020-11-18 | House | Introduced By Representative Julie Calley |