MI HB6431 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-20 - Assigned Pa 429'18 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Insurance; health insurers; Medigap plans; modify. Amends secs. 2266, 3801, 3803, 3811a, 3813, 3815, 3819a, 3827, 3829, 3831, 3835, 3843 & 3847 of 1956 PA 218 (MCL 500.2266 et seq.); adds sec. 3811b & repeals secs. 3804 & 3808 of 1956 PA 218 (MCL 500.3804 & 500.3808).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Insurance; health insurers; Medigap plans; modify. Amends secs. 2266, 3801, 3803, 3811a, 3813, 3815, 3819a, 3827, 3829, 3831, 3835, 3843 & 3847 of 1956 PA 218 (MCL 500.2266 et seq.); adds sec. 3811b & repeals secs. 3804 & 3808 of 1956 PA 218 (MCL 500.3804 & 500.3808).

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-12-12 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 766 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-06 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-04 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 666 (Y: 107 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-04 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-12-20HouseAssigned Pa 429'18 With Immediate Effect
2018-12-20HouseFiled With Secretary Of State 12/20/2018 @ 1:36 Pm
2018-12-20HouseApproved By The Governor 12/19/2018 @ 9:23 Pm
2018-12-18HousePresented To The Governor 12/18/2018 @ 1:06 Pm
2018-12-12HouseBill Ordered Enrolled
2018-12-12HouseFull Title Agreed To
2018-12-12HouseReturned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect And Full Title
2018-12-12SenateInserted Full Title
2018-12-12SenatePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 766 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
2018-12-11SenatePlaced On Order Of Third Reading
2018-12-11SenateReported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s)
2018-12-06SenateReferred To Committee Of The Whole
2018-12-06SenateCommittee Recommended Immediate Effect
2018-12-06SenateReported Favorably Without Amendment
2018-12-05SenateReferred To Committee On Insurance
2018-12-04HouseTransmitted
2018-12-04HouseTitle Amended
2018-12-04HousePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 666 Yeas 107 Nays 1
2018-12-04HouseRead A Third Time
2018-12-04HousePlaced On Immediate Passage
2018-12-04HousePlaced On Third Reading
2018-12-04HouseSubstitute H-2 Adopted
2018-12-04HouseRead A Second Time
2018-12-04HouseReferred To Second Reading
2018-12-04HouseReported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2
2018-10-17HouseBill Electronically Reproduced 10/04/2018
2018-10-04HouseReferred To Committee On Health Policy
2018-10-04HouseRead A First Time
2018-10-04HouseIntroduced By Representative Hank Vaupel

Subjects


Michigan State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2018-HB-6431
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/billintroduced/House/htm/2018-HIB-6431.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/billengrossed/House/htm/2018-HEBH-6431.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/billengrossed/House/htm/2018-HEBS-6431.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/billenrolled/House/htm/2018-HNB-6431.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/publicact/htm/2018-PA-0429.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/House/htm/2018-HJ-12-04-075.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/Senate/htm/2018-SJ-12-06-076.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/Senate/htm/2018-SJ-12-12-078.htm

Bill Comments

feedback